Al-Numi, Mussa Hasan Mohammed (CPSO#: 85797)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Nov 2006 to 02 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008