Al-Obaidi, Adel Hassen Muhasen (CPSO#: 108384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEL HASSEN MUHASEN AL-OBAIDI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL-OBAIDI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL-OBAIDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-OBAIDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-OBAIDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AL-OBAIDI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. AL-OBAIDI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 22 Feb 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 23 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Apr 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017