AlObaidi, Rashid Abdulaziz R (CPSO#: 87207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Room 3E20
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 570-2100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASHID ABDULAZIZ R ALOBAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOBAIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Aug 2007
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2007 to 01 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2008 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2017