Al-Obaidi, Sarah (CPSO#: 106430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (905) 813-3852
Fax: (905) 813-3853
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH AL-OBAIDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-OBAIDI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. AL-OBAIDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-OBAIDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-OBAIDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-OBAIDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-OBAIDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018