Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Al-Omair, Ahmad Mohammad Hussain Alsalim (CPSO#: 68404)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999