Al-Omi, Mohammed Nasser Mohammed (CPSO#: 92328)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Feb 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013