Al-Omran, Mohammed A M (CPSO#: 71781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Room 7-074 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6047
Fax: (416) 864-6012
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Vaughn Diagnostic and
Cardiac Clinic
2640 Rutherford Road, Suite 102
Concord ON  L4K 0H3
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-3001
Fax: (905) 417-3006
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Omran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Omran ( CPSO# 71781 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 7-074 Bond Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 02 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED A M AL-OMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-OMRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2014