Al-Oneizi, Ebtesam Mohammed Saleh (CPSO#: 74296)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Sep 2000
Resident 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002