AlOtaibi, Naif Mitla S (CPSO#: 97633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAIF MITLA S ALOTAIBI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALOTAIBI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOTAIBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALOTAIBI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALOTAIBI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 02 Jul 2012
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018