Al-Otaibi, Sultan Thoail (CPSO#: 68556)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998