Al-Othman, Ghassan Abdullah Abdullatif (CPSO#: 67495)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2000