Al-Otibi, Merdas Hajraf F (CPSO#: 79229)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2003 to 05 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2004 to 05 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2005 to 05 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2006 to 05 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2007 to 05 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2008 to 05 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011