AlQaderi, Aishah E A M (CPSO#: 110282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AISHAH E A M ALQADERI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALQADERI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALQADERI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQADERI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALQADERI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALQADERI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALQADERI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 26 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018