Al-Qahtani, Abdulkareem Ali (CPSO#: 82005)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005