Al-Qahtani, Awad Abdul Razaq H A (CPSO#: 78332)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2003 to 28 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2004 to 28 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2005 to 28 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2006 to 28 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2007 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009