AlQahtani, Saad Qaddah S (CPSO#: 88198)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AlQahtani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 1102, 38 Grenville Street, Toronto, ON M4Y 1A5
Date Received: 10 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2015