Al-Qatari, Mohammed Abdul Jaleel Mansour (CPSO#: 75367)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002