AlQubbany, Atif Wageh Ismail (CPSO#: 92324)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 18 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015