Al-Quliti, Khalid Wasel K (CPSO#: 87604)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 06 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009