AlQurini, Naser M Kh M S (CPSO#: 104896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 10 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Department of Palliative
Care Medicine
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASER M KH M S ALQURINI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALQURINI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ALQURINI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQURINI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALQURINI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALQURINI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALQURINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2014 to 11 Dec 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018