Al-Rabghi, Ahmed Mohammed Ali Shotayan (CPSO#: 68493)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997