AlRadwan, Hussain Ali Ali (CPSO#: 88240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 TERRACE HILL STREET
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5857
Fax: (519) 751-5830
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-704-4195
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

115 Delhi STREET
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSSAIN ALI ALI ALRADWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALRADWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013