Al-Rajaa, Najlaa Saad Hendi (CPSO#: 79868)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2006