Al-Rasheed, Taiba Abdulmohsen M (CPSO#: 87471)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2007 to 02 Oct 2007
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2008 to 03 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2009 to 03 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2010 to 03 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014