Al-Rehaily, Ali Mohammed (CPSO#: 69615)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 10 Jul 1995 to 10 Aug 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1999 to 27 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001