Al-Rujaib, Mashael Khalid Khalaf (CPSO#: 88023)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 11 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013