Al-Rushaid, Salah Hamad Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 78454)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 18 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 18 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2004 to 18 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2005