Al-Saadon, Khalid B H (CPSO#: 61633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Mitton St. N 2nd Floor
Sarnia ON  N7T 6G6
Phone: (519) 491-8082
Fax: (519) 491-6738
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Al-Saadon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Al-Saadon ( CPSO# 61633 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
130 Mitton Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 6G6
Phone Number: (519) 491-8082

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID B H AL-SAADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAADON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012