Al-Saadoun, Saad Ageal Thamer (CPSO#: 75743)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2000 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2001 to 31 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2002 to 15 May 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2003