Al-Saati, Ma'ad Faisal A (CPSO#: 97287)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, French

Education:King Khalid University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2012 to 25 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013