Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Al-Sabawi, Naiem Mustafa (CPSO#: 67465)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998