Al-Sadkhan, Haydar Karim Majeed (CPSO#: 79952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Blue Water Health - Norman Site
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 5407
Fax: (519) 336-8780
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haydar Al-Sadkhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Sadkhan ( CPSO# 79952 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Bluewater Health - Norman Site
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAYDAR KARIM MAJEED AL-SADKHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SADKHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jul 2003 to 01 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005