Al-Safadi, Samah Mahmoud Hassan (CPSO#: 76934)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008