Al-Saffar, Hussain Ali Abdulkarim (CPSO#: 86231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L8
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75076
Fax: (613) 739-6851
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1800 Bank St., Suite 1
Ottawa ON  K1V 0W3
Canada
Phone: 613-627-4700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danah Al-Breiki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Saffar ( CPSO# 86231 )
Dr. D. Al-Breiki ( CPSO# 84177 )

Business Address:
Eye Institute
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6805


Corporation Name: Al-Saffar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Saffar ( CPSO# 86231 )
Dr. D. Al-Breiki ( CPSO# 84177 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 17 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSSAIN ALI ABDULKARIM AL-SAFFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAFFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2007 to 24 Aug 2007
PEAP - Resident - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2007 to 17 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Sep 2008 to 18 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2009 to 18 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2010 to 18 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2011 to 17 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012