Al-Sagheir, Ahmed Ibraheem Mohammed (CPSO#: 74358)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 21 Oct 1999 to 17 Nov 1999
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 04 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2005