Al-Saghir, Abdullah Hassan Ali (CPSO#: 82086)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2005 to 28 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 28 Feb 2007
Research Fellows - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2007