Al-Saigh, Manal Abdulhameed Rajab (CPSO#: 78969)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2003 to 27 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013