Al-Sajee, Dhuha Mahmood Alwan (CPSO#: 111449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 17 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iraq

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHUHA MAHMOOD ALWAN AL-SAJEE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-SAJEE is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL-SAJEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-SAJEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-SAJEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-SAJEE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-SAJEE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2017 to 16 May 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 17 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018