Al-Saleem, Noura Mohammed M (CPSO#: 87521)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2007 to 21 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2008 to 21 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2010