Al-Saleh, Khalid Abdulrahman A (CPSO#: 78961)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2003 to 30 May 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012