Al-Saleh, Noha (CPSO#: 75701)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Leeds, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 02 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 2001 to 02 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 2002 to 02 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 2003 to 02 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005