Al-Saqabi, Faisal Bader A A (CPSO#: 75436)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 04 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2001 to 04 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2002 to 04 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006