Al-Semaan, Yousef Mohammad (CPSO#: 69759)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jan 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 07 Jan 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 07 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 07 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jan 2000 to 08 Jan 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jan 2001