Al-Shabanah, Mohammad Othman Mohammad (CPSO#: 65892)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997