Al-Shaer, Abdulaziz Rashed Ali (CPSO#: 78884)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2003 to 29 Apr 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005