Al-Shafai, Nabeel Saud (CPSO#: 71821)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 13 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 13 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2000 to 13 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2001 to 13 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2014