Al-Shaibi, Khairiah Faisal Ameen (CPSO#: 79273)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2003 to 09 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006