Al-Shaikh, Abdulelah Abdulrahman A (CPSO#: 78797)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009