Al-Shaikh, Tariq Ali Taher (CPSO#: 60293)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 31 May 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997