Al-Shakman, Khalad M (CPSO#: 82342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
86 DAWSON RD UNIT 3
GUELPH, ON
N1H 1A8
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone: 2267061501 Ext. 7
Fax: 5197639871
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 charlton ave
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33856
Fax: (905) 521-6100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALAD M AL-SHAKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAKMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2005 to 08 Jul 2005
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2005 to 10 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2006 to 10 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2007 to 10 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2008 to 10 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2011